Zoonoses and Emerging Livestock Systems ZELS Reducing the risk to livestock and people programme Associated Studentships ZELS-AS
Lead Research Organisation:
University of Glasgow
Department Name: College of Medical, Veterinary, Life Sci
Abstract
Doctoral Training Partnerships: a range of postgraduate training is funded by the Research Councils. For information on current funding routes, see the common terminology at https://www.ukri.org/apply-for-funding/how-we-fund-studentships/. Training grants may be to one organisation or to a consortia of research organisations. This portal will show the lead organisation only.
Organisations
People |
ORCID iD |
Sarah Cleaveland (Training Grant Holder) |
Studentship Projects
Project Reference | Relationship | Related To | Start | End | Student Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
BB/N503563/1 | 30/09/2015 | 29/09/2019 | |||
2299842 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 16/09/2015 | 29/09/2019 | Violet Forbes |
1653816 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 27/09/2015 | 27/09/2019 | Rebecca Bodenham |
1659315 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 30/09/2015 | 31/03/2019 | Stefano Catalano |
1659199 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 30/09/2015 | 11/12/2015 | Marianne Carson |
1855447 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 30/09/2015 | 29/09/2018 | Jennika Virhia |
1854885 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 30/09/2015 | 29/09/2019 | Rachel Hopper |
1811252 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 04/10/2015 | 03/04/2019 | Joshua Sealy |
1859791 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 01/12/2015 | 29/04/2019 | Ruth Maganga |
1681320 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 01/12/2015 | 29/02/2020 | Laura Craighead |
1681346 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 01/12/2015 | 30/05/2019 | Mahbubur Rahman |
1654039 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 11/01/2016 | 29/06/2019 | Marku Nyarobi |
1689843 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 26/01/2016 | 24/07/2019 | Bhagyalakshmi Chengat Prakashbabu |
1859768 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 24/04/2016 | 23/10/2021 | Gemma Chaters |
1798449 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 30/04/2016 | 29/09/2019 | Bedaso Edao |
1815378 | Studentship | BB/N503563/1 | 01/11/2016 | 29/09/2019 | Hassaan Bin Aslam |